US HB4558 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Grand Staircase Escalante Enhancement Act This bill establishes the Escalante Canyons National Park and Preserve within the Escalante Canyons National Monument (established by this bill and consisting of approximately 243,241 acres) in Utah. Federal lands within the park and preserve, including lands or interests acquired by the United States afterwards, are withdrawn from: entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. The bill also establishes the Grand Staircase National Monument (consisting of approximately 211,983 acres) and the Kaiparowits National Monument (consisting of approximately 551,117 acres). A management council shall implement comprehensive management plans for the park and preserve and the monuments. Federal land managers must adhere to the management plans created by the council. The public lands excluded from the lands and interests in lands reserved within the modified boundaries of the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument under the Presidential Proclamation dated December 4, 2017, shall be open to: entry, location, selection, sale, or other disposition under the public land laws; disposition under all laws related to mineral and geothermal leasing; and location, entry, and patent under the mining laws. Interior shall convey to the state of Utah the Hole in the Rock Road (BLM [Bureau of Land Management] Road 200).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grand Staircase Escalante Enhancement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-12-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback