US HB4512 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Outdoors for All Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to establish an outdoor recreation legacy partnership grant program under which Interior may award grants to states, certain political subdivisions of a state, special purpose districts, or certain Indian tribes for projects to (1) acquire land and water for parks and other outdoor recreation purposes, and (2) develop new or renovate existing outdoor recreation facilities. As a condition for receiving a grant, a recipient shall provide matching funds in cash or in kind equal to 100% of the amounts available under the grant. A grant recipient may use the grant to acquire land or water providing outdoor recreation opportunities to the public and develop or renovate outdoor recreational facilities, with priority given to projects that create or significantly enhance access to park and recreational opportunities in an urban neighborhood or community, engage and empower underserved communities and youth, provide opportunities for youth employment or job training, establish or expand public-private partnerships, and take advantage of coordination among various levels of government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outdoors for All Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-10-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-09-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-09-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5986 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1334 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB1458 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback