US HB4508 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act This bill requires the U.S. Agency for International Development to award at least 50% of the number of scholarships under the Merit and Needs-Based Scholarship Program to Pakistani women for each of the calendar years 2020-2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Malala Yousafzai Scholarship Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 82 (Y: 374 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2020-03-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-03HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 16 (Roll no. 82). (text: CR H1450-1451)
2020-03-03HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1457-1458)
2020-03-03HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-03-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4508.
2020-03-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1450-1452)
2020-03-03HouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-12-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-09-26HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback