US HB4492 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an interagency forum for biodefense preparedness, and for other purposes.
Title
Biosecurity Information Optimization for Defense Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2021-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2021-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-07-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Homeland Security, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4492/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4492/BILLS-117hr4492ih.pdf |