US HB4484 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require short-term limited duration insurance issuers to renew or continue in force such insurance coverage at the option of the enrollees, and for other purposes.
Title
FLEX Act Flexibility Through Lower Expenses Health Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-25 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7912-7913) |
2019-09-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2294 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1170 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2438-2439)
SB1170 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2438-2439)
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Self-employed
Small business
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Self-employed
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4484/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4484/BILLS-116hr4484ih.pdf |