US HB4454 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a process for the Board on Geographic Names to review and revise offensive names of Federal land units, to create an advisory committee to recommend Federal land unit names to be reviewed by the Board, and for other purposes.
Title
Reconciliation in Place Names Act
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-07-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2400 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4454/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4454/BILLS-117hr4454ih.pdf |