US HB4446 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 648.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 648.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act to extend the expiration date of the Commission, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act to extend: (1) the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission through September 30, 2019 (currently September 30, 2018), or at an earlier date determined by the commission after submitting its final report to Congress; and (2) the final reporting date from January 31, 2018, to January 31, 2019.
Title
To amend the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act to extend the expiration date of the Commission, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 648. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-361. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-07-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6202) |
2018-07-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4446. |
2018-07-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6201-6202) |
2018-07-16 | House | Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 636. |
2018-07-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-822. |
2018-03-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Government operations and politics
U.S. history
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Commemorative events and holidays
Government operations and politics
U.S. history
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands