US HB4432 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Critical Infrastructure Against Drones and Emerging Threats Act This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to address issues related to threats of unmanned aircraft systems (drones) and other emerging threats. Specifically, DHS must request additional information from other federal, state, local, and private sector agencies relating to such threats associated with new technologies; develop and disseminate a security threat assessment regarding drones and other emerging threats associated with such new technologies; and establish and utilize a secure communications and information technology infrastructure, including data-mining and other advanced analytical tools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Critical Infrastructure Against Drones and Emerging Threats Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H993)
2020-02-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4432.
2020-02-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H993-994)
2020-02-10HouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-11-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 250.
2019-11-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-309.
2019-09-25HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-09-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-09-20HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback