US HB4425 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-205. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-205. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 110 East Powerhouse Road in Collegeville, Minnesota, as the "Eugene J. McCarthy Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 110 East Powerhouse Road in Collegeville, Minnesota, as the "Eugene J. McCarthy Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 110 East Powerhouse Road in Collegeville, Minnesota, as the "Eugene J. McCarthy Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-205. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5192-5193) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2932) |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4425. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2932-2933) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Minnesota
Postal service
Senate
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Minnesota
Postal service
Senate