US HB4424 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Guard Act of 2016 This bill authorizes the removal, on a case by case basis, of the $300 cap on travel expense reimbursements to certain members of the Selected Reserve of the Ready Reserve who: (1) live in a rural area in the same state as the inactive duty training location; and (2) are required to travel to the inactive training location using a boat or aircraft due to limited or nonexistent vehicular routes, or from a permanent residence more than 75 miles from that location.
Title
Rural Guard Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Mark Takai [D-HI] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] |
Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
SB2943 (Related) 2016-12-23 - Signed by President.
SB2943 (Related) 2016-12-23 - Signed by President.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4424/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4424/BILLS-114hr4424ih.pdf |