US HB4406 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend titles XI and XIX of the Social Security Act to provide increased financial support to the territories under the Medicaid program, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Medicaid in the U.S. Territories Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4406/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4406/BILLS-117hr4406ih.pdf |