US HB4404 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State CHIP Flexibility Act of 2017 This bill establishes an exception to the requirement that unused Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) allotments to states for FY2017 be reduced by one-third. A state shall receive the exception if: (1) the remaining allotment amounts are with respect to expenditures incurred during any quarter of FY2017, (2) the state submitted a claim under its child health plan after September 30, 2017 and before December 31, 2017, and (3) the state could have alternatively submitted a claim for federal funding under its state Medicaid program.
Title
State CHIP Flexibility Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Jason Lewis [R-MN] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Child health
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local finance
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4404/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4404/BILLS-115hr4404ih.pdf |