US HB4403 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies certain consumer protections regarding debt collection to debt owed to a federal agency and to debt buyers. A federal agency that is a creditor may not sell or transfer a debt to a debt collector until 90 days after the obligation becomes delinquent or defaults. Specified notice to the consumer of such a sale or transfer is required. A collector of debt owed to a federal agency may not collect any interest, fee, charge, or expense that is (1) unreasonable in relation to actual costs, (2) not authorized by a contract between the debt collector and the federal agency, or (3) greater than 10% of the amount collected. The Government Accountability Office must report on the use of debt collectors by federal, state, and local government agencies.
Title
Stop Debt Collection Abuse Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538. |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-654. |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 0. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2516 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
State and local government operations
User charges and fees