US HB4403 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act This bill amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to revise requirements regarding the public disclosure of personally identifiable information contained in the manifest of vessels or aircraft entering any U.S. port or place to direct the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to ensure that any such information, including social security numbers, passport numbers, and residential addresses, are removed from any manifest signed and transmitted to the CBP before it is disclosed to the public.
Title
Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3359) |
2018-04-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4403. |
2018-04-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3359-3364) |
2018-04-17 | House | Mr. Reichert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 490. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-639. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB998 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2651-2652)
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Business records
Customs enforcement
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Marine and inland water transportation
Right of privacy
Business records
Customs enforcement
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Marine and inland water transportation
Right of privacy