US HB4402 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Inland Waters Security Review Act This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security to submit to Congress an inland waters threat analysis that includes current and potential terrorism and criminal threats, security challenges and mitigation efforts; vulnerabilities that hinder effective security, counterterrorism, anti-trafficking efforts, and trade flow in inland waters; and metrics and performance measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inland Waters Security Review Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-12-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9376)
2019-12-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4402.
2019-12-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9376-9377)
2019-12-09HouseMs. Slotkin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-11-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
2019-11-19HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-299.
2019-10-23HouseOrdered to be Reported.
2019-10-23HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-23HouseSubcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism Discharged.
2019-10-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
2019-09-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-09-19HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback