US HB4387 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Public Health Service Act to improve maternal health, to improve obstetric care in rural areas, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2021 Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-07-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-15HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2021-07-15HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-07-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-07-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1675 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback