US HB4387 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the Growth Accelerator Fund Competition program within the Small Business Administration (SBA). Specifically, the bill requires the SBA, prioritizing small business concerns in underserved communities, to award prizes on a competitive basis to U.S. private entities that (1) assist small business concerns in accessing capital, mentors, and networking opportunities; and (2) advise small business concerns on topics such as market analysis, company strategy, revenue growth, and securing funding. The SBA must also develop metrics to evaluate the the program's effectiveness and benefits to the people of the United States that (1) are science-based and statistically driven, (2) reflect the SBA's mission, and (3) include factors relating to the program's economic impact.
Title
To establish Growth Accelerator Fund Competition within the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-10-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8277) |
2019-10-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4387. |
2019-10-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8277-8278) |
2019-10-21 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 189. |
2019-10-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-238. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-09-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4109 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Business education
Commerce
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Business education
Commerce
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business