US HB4386 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Money Remittances Improvement Act of 2014 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury, with respect to compliance with reporting requirements for monetary instrument transactions of financial institutions, to rely upon examinations conducted by a state supervisory agency of a category of financial institution if: (1) the category is required to comply with federal requirements, or (2) the state supervisory agency examines the category for compliance with federal requirements. Instructs the Secretary to consult with state supervisory agencies when issuing rules to implement this Act.
Title
Money Remittances Improvement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-156. |
2014-08-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5329) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2014-05-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3422-3423) |
2014-05-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4386. |
2014-05-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3422-3424) |
2014-05-06 | House | Mrs. Capito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1694 (Related) 2013-04-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1840 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2208 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1840 (Related) 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2208 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Department of the Treasury
Federal officials
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Department of the Treasury
Federal officials
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations