US HB4385 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-170.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To extend authorization of the Reclamation States Emergency Drought Relief Act of 1991.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drought Preparedness Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-23HouseBecame Public Law No: 118-170.
2024-12-23HouseSigned by President.
2024-12-23HousePresented to President.
2024-12-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2024-12-18SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7133)
2024-12-18SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2024-09-11SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
2024-02-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2024-02-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-02-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H403)
2024-02-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4385.
2024-02-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H403-404)
2024-02-05HouseMr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2024-01-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 298.
2024-01-30HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-365.
2023-11-08HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2023-11-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-11-08HouseSubcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged
2023-09-28HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2023-09-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.
2023-06-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-06-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB4242 (Same As) 2024-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 620.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback