US HB4379 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to require the Secretary of Agriculture to make loan guarantees and grants to finance certain improvements to school lunch facilities, to train school food service personnel, and for other purposes.
Title
School Food Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2021-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB876 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1651)
SB4380 (Related) 2022-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB4380 (Related) 2022-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4379/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4379/BILLS-117hr4379ih.pdf |