US HB436 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fracking Disclosure and Safety Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fracking Disclosure and Safety Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB585 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB4006 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB4007 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB4014 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback