US HB4340 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit commercial sexual orientation conversion therapy, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Therapeutic Fraud Prevention Act of 2023

Sponsors

Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD]
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Becca Balint [D-VT]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Robert Garcia [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]
Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.
2023-06-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2023-06-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2023-06-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2176 (Same As) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback