US HB434 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-111. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-111. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Emancipation National Historic Trail, which extends approximately 51 miles and follows the migration route taken by newly freed slaves and other persons of African descent from Galveston, Texas, to Houston, Texas, to be studied for designation as a national scenic trail.
Title
Emancipation National Historic Trail Study Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-111. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-01-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S163) |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-07-24 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7353) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 434. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7353-7361) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 99. |
2019-06-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-135. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2646 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Texas
U.S. history
Land transfers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Texas
U.S. history