US HB4329 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Rural Electrification Act of 1936 to improve access to broadband telecommunications services in rural areas, including by encouraging the provision of broadband loans and grants to increase broadband service in rural ports, and for other purposes.
Title
Broadband Internet for Small Ports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2021-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1908 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4329/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4329/BILLS-117hr4329ih.pdf |