US HB4326 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1211 Towanda Avenue in Bloomington, Illinois, as the "Sgt. Josh Rodgers Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1211 Towanda Avenue in Bloomington, Illinois, as the "Sgt. Josh Rodgers Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1211 Towanda Avenue in Bloomington, Illinois, as the "Sgt. Josh Rodgers Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9726) |
2018-11-29 | House | H.Amdt.982 On agreeing to the Comer amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | H.Amdt.982 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Comer. (consideration: CR H9726; text: CR H9726) |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9726) |
2018-11-29 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Illinois
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Illinois
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service