US HB4306 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Federal Railroad Administration (FRA) to conduct an evaluation of the safety, security, and environmental risks of transporting liquefied natural gas (LNG) by rail. Among other things, the FRA must perform physical testing of rail tank cars, including ensuring such rail tank cars are able to withstand the effects of an accident or impact and prevent or mitigate the release of LNG; analyze multiple release scenarios, including derailments, front-end collisions, and rear-end collisions; and examine the effects of exposure to climate conditions across rail networks, including temperature, humidity, and other factors that may influence performance of the inner or outer walls of rail tank cars. The Government Accountability Office must conduct an independent evaluation to ensure all review requirements under this bill have been satisfactorily met.
Title
Protecting Communities from Liquefied Natural Gas Trains Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Accidents
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Railroads
Rural conditions and development
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Railroads
Rural conditions and development
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4306/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4306/BILLS-116hr4306ih.pdf |