US HB430 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

TANF Extension Act of 2019 This bill extends appropriations through June 30, 2019, for Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program grants to states and related assistance grants to U.S. territories such as Puerto Rico and the Virgin Islands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF Extension Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-01-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H531)
2019-01-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 430.
2019-01-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H531-534)
2019-01-14HouseMs. Chu, Judy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback