US HB4285 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-61. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-61. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend and modify certain authorities and requirements relating to the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 535 (Y: 417 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-61. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-09-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-09-30 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5632) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-09-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 535). (text: CR 9/17/2019 H7729-7730) |
2019-09-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7767-7768) |
2019-09-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-09-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4285. |
2019-09-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7729-7732) |
2019-09-17 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2484 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2489 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2489 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Family services
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health facilities and institutions
Low- and moderate-income housing
Philippines
Transportation costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Asia
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Family services
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health facilities and institutions
Low- and moderate-income housing
Philippines
Transportation costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care