US HB4264 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hyde Park Land Conveyance Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior, upon request of the city of Hyde Park, Utah, to convey to the city without consideration a specified 80-acre parcel of Bureau of Land Management land, including improvements, for use for public purposes. Interior shall complete the conveyance of the land and improvements within one year of the city's request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hyde Park Land Conveyance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 392.
2018-01-25HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-527.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 12.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2302 (Related) 2018-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback