US HB426 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Lives Using Surplus Equipment Act of 2017 This bill invalidates any regulation, rule, guidance, recommendation, or policy issued after May 15, 2015, that limits the sale or donation of excess federal property to state and local law enforcement agencies unless enacted by Congress. Additionally, it prohibits the use of federal funds to implement such regulation, rule, guidance, recommendation, or policy. Property that was recalled or seized on or after May 15, 2015, must be returned, replaced, or reissued to the state or local law enforcement agency.
Title
Protecting Lives Using Surplus Equipment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1087 (Related) 2017-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/426/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr426/BILLS-115hr426ih.pdf |