US HB4255 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Comptroller General of the United States to conduct a study on the processes used by the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration for studying and deploying crash test dummies, and for other purposes.
Title
FAIR Crash Tests Act Furthering Advanced and Inclusive Research for Crash Tests Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-06-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2007 (Related) 2021-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4255/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4255/BILLS-117hr4255ih.pdf |