US HB4255 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-11 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-11 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accountability in Grants Act of 2012 - Amends the Clean Air Act to prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) from awarding grants, contracts, cooperative agreements, or other financial assistance under the national research and development program for the prevention and control of air pollution for any program, project, or activity to occur outside the United States and its territories and possessions.
Title
Accountability in Grants Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Whitfield [R-KY] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Chip Cravaack [R-MN] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK] | Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2012-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2226 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Air quality
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Public contracts and procurement
Research and development
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Public contracts and procurement
Research and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4255/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4255/BILLS-112hr4255ih.pdf |