US HB4240 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No Fly for Foreign Fighters Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Government Accountability Office to study and report to Congress within one year on: (1) whether past weaknesses in the operation and administration of the Terrorist Screening Database (TSDB) and its subsets (e.g., the No Fly list) have been addressed, and (2) the extent to which additional changes may address or mitigate existing vulnerabilities. The study and report must include, with respect to the TSDB, information on: (1) timely integration of information, (2) increased demands for information, (3) accessibility to relevant agencies, and (4) identification of known or suspected terrorists by users.
Title
No Fly for Foreign Fighters Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2020) |
2016-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4240. |
2016-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2019-2022) |
2016-04-27 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-04-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 377. |
2016-04-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-495. |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-01-08 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2015-12-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-12-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-12-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Government studies and investigations
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Government studies and investigations
Terrorism