US HB4229 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Broadband DATA Act Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to change the way broadband data is collected, verified, and reported. Specifically, the FCC must collect and disseminate granular broadband service availability data (broadband maps) from wired, fixed-wireless, satellite, and mobile broadband providers. To do this, the FCC is required to establish the Broadband Serviceable Location Fabric (a dataset of geocoded information for all broadband service locations, atop which broadband maps are overlaid) as the vehicle for reporting broadband service availability data. Additionally, the FCC must put forth specified requirements for service availability data collected from broadband providers, and it must create a challenge process to enable the submission of independent data challenging the accuracy of FCC broadband maps. The Government Accountability Office must report on identified locations where fixed broadband can be installed to improve the quality and completeness of data sources for the fabric.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband DATA Act Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Sponsors

Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
2019-12-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10287-10289)
2019-12-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4229.
2019-12-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10287-10291)
2019-12-16HouseMr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-12-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 279.
2019-12-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-350.
2019-11-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-11-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-14HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-11-14HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-09-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-09-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-09-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1822 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-130. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback