US HB4227 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it unlawful to willfully, knowingly, or recklessly submit inaccurate broadband coverage information or data (mapping data) to the Federal Communications Commission.
Title
MAPS Act Mapping Accuracy Promotes Services Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10291) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4227. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10291-10292) |
2019-12-16 | House | Mr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 278. |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-349. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-11-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-09-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Geography and mapping
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Geography and mapping
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications