US HB4227 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS): (1) to assess the activities that DHS is undertaking to support emergency response providers and the private sector to prevent, mitigate, and respond to the threat of vehicular terrorism; and (2) based on such assessment, to develop and submit to the congressional homeland security committees a strategy to improve its efforts to support such providers and the private sector in that regard. The strategy shall include: an examination of the current threat of vehicular terrorism; methods to improve DHS information sharing activities with such providers and the private sector regarding best practices to prevent, mitigate, and respond to the increasing threat of vehicular terrorism; and training activities that DHS can provide for such providers to prevent and respond to such threat.
Title
Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments RC# 456 (Y: 388 N: 2 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 125 (Y: 417 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 125 (Y: 417 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 388 - 2 (Roll No. 456). (consideration: CR H10435-10436; text: CR H10414) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 4227. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Mr. Estes (KS) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H10414-10415) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4162 Amendment SA 4162 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4162 Amendment SA 4162 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Cassidy. (consideration: CR S7822; text: CR S7822) To modify the bill. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7822) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 2 (Roll no. 125). |
2018-03-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1767-1768) |
2018-03-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4227. |
2018-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1666-1667; text: CR H1666) |
2018-03-19 | House | Mr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 465. |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-609. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged. |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-11-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2077 (Related) 2017-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Motor vehicles
Public-private cooperation
Terrorism
Crime prevention
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Motor vehicles
Public-private cooperation
Terrorism