US HB4225 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-19 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-19 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to establish the Acquisition Review Board of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Acquisition Review Board Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-06-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2422 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4225/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4225/BILLS-118hr4225ih.pdf |