US HB4220 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 675.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 675.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water and Agriculture Tax Reform Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to permit tax-exempt mutual ditch or irrigation companies to earn income from dispositions of certain real property and stock interests without affecting their tax-exempt status, but requires that such income be used to pay the costs of operations, maintenance, and capital improvements of such a company. The bill also establishes a rule regarding the organizational governance of mutual ditch or irrigation companies. Where state law provides that such a company may be organized in a manner that permits voting on a basis that is pro rata to share ownership on corporate governance matters, an organization's qualification as a mutual ditch or irrigation company must be determined without taking into account whether its member shareholders have one vote on corporate governance matters per share held in the corporation.
Title
Water and Agriculture Tax Reform Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 675. |
2016-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-862. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-12-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB384 (Related) 2015-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Corporate finance and management
Farmland
Financial services and investments
Land transfers
Securities
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Water use and supply
Corporate finance and management
Farmland
Financial services and investments
Land transfers
Securities
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Water use and supply