US HB421 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making continuing appropriations for the Coast Guard. This bill provides FY2019 continuing appropriations to the U.S. Coast Guard for any period during which interim or full-year FY2019 appropriations for the Coast Guard are not in effect. The appropriations are provided to the Coast Guard for pay and allowances for members of the Coast Guard, civilian employees, and contractors; the payment of a death gratuity, funeral travel, and the temporary continuation of the basic allowance for housing for dependents of members of the Coast Guard dying on active duty; and other functions authorized by law. The appropriations are provided until the enactment of specified Coast Guard appropriations legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making continuing appropriations for the Coast Guard.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H665)
2019-01-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB350 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB367 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB21 (Related) 2019-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 2. (text: CR S27)
HB374 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback