US HB42 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to submit a report that describes select state and local programs and policies related to the preparedness and protection of first responders, which may include information on: the degree to which such programs and policies include consideration of the presence of a first responder's family in an area impacted by a terrorist attack, the availability of personal protective equipment for first responders, and the availability of home Medkits for first responders and their families for biological incident response. The GAO may provide information: (1) in a format that delineates high risk urban areas from rural communities; and (2) on the degree to which the selected state and local programs and policies were developed or are being executed with funding from the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), including grants from the State Homeland Security Grant Program or the Urban Area Security Initiative. DHS shall consider the report's findings and assess its applicability for federal first responders.
Title
FRIENDS Act First Responder Identification of Emergency Needs in Disaster Situations
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3060 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Terrorism
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/42/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr42/BILLS-116hr42ih.pdf |