US HB42 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Directors of Veterans Integrated Service Networks of the Department of Veterans Affairs to enter into contracts with appropriate civilian accreditation entities or appropriate health care evaluation entities to investigate medical centers of the Department of Veterans Affairs. This bill authorizes the Director of a Veterans Integrated Service Network of the Department of Veterans Affairs to contract with an entity specializing in civilian accreditation or health care evaluation to investigate any medical center within the network to assess deficiencies of the facilities at such medical center.
Title
To authorize the Directors of Veterans Integrated Service Networks of the Department of Veterans Affairs to enter into contracts with appropriate civilian accreditation entities or appropriate health care evaluation entities to investigate medical centers of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1266 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-95. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Licensing and registrations
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Licensing and registrations
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/42/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr42/BILLS-115hr42ih.pdf |