US HB4193 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Guaranteed 3% COLA for Seniors Act of 2009 - Directs the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the Department of Labor to prepare and publish a monthly Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers that indicates changes over time in expenditures for consumption which are typical for individuals in the United States who are age 62 or older. Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to: (1) require the use of such index to compute cost-of-living increases for Social Security benefits; and (2) provide, in the case of individuals who have attained age 62, for an annual cost-of-living increase of at least 3%.
Title
Guaranteed 3% COLA for Seniors Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-12-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-12-03 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-12-03 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-12-03 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB2429 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB5275 (Related) 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2429 (Related) 2009-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
HB5275 (Related) 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4193/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4193/BILLS-111hr4193ih.pdf |