US HB4173 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Crisis Line Study Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) conduct a study on the outcomes and the efficacy of the toll-free Veterans Crisis Line during the five-year period beginning January 1, 2014, based on an analysis of national suicide data and data collected from the line, and (2) submit such study to Congress by May 31, 2019. Such study shall address: (1) the efficacy of the line in leading veterans to sustained mental health regimens and suicide prevention; (2) the line's visibility; (3) the role of the line as part of the VA's mental health care services; (4) whether receiving sustained mental health care affects suicidality and whether veterans previously receiving VA mental health care use the line in times of crisis; (5) the line's effectiveness in assisting veterans at risk for suicide when it is contacted by a non-veteran; (6) the line's overall efficacy in preventing suicides and whether the number of contacts affects such efficacy; (7) the line's long-term efficacy in preventing repeated suicide attempts and whether such efficacy is temporary; (8) whether referral to mental health care affects the risk of suicide; and (9) the line's efficacy in promoting continued mental health care for those veterans who are at high risk for suicide whose suicide was prevented.
Title
Veterans Crisis Line Study Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 618 (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 618). (text: 11/7/2017 CR H8564) |
2017-11-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8614) |
2017-11-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4173. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8563-8566) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 295. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-400. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2174 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Mental health
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Mental health
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care