US HB4172 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Aurora, Colorado, as the Lieutenant Colonel John W. Mosley VA Clinic.
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Aurora, Colorado, as the Lieutenant Colonel John W. Mosley VA Clinic.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-12 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-57. |
2021-11-12 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-11-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7450) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4537) |
2021-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4172. |
2021-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4537-4539) |
2021-09-20 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |