US HB4171 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for a transition process to make electromagnetic spectrum between the frequencies of 3700 megahertz and 4200 megahertz available for allocation and auction, to make available Federal spectrum for non-Federal use or shared Federal and non-Federal use, and for other purposes.
Title
WIN 5G Act Wireless Investment Now in 5G Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-08-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3475 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB1968 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1968 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Radio spectrum allocation
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Radio spectrum allocation
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4171/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4171/BILLS-116hr4171ih.pdf |