US HB4171 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to extend the authority to conduct telework travel expenses test programs, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title 5, United States Code, to extend the authority to conduct telework travel expenses test programs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9814) |
2017-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4171. |
2017-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9814-9815) |
2017-12-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-12-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342. |
2017-12-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-460. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commuting
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Transportation costs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Transportation costs