US HB4130 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 17, United States Code, to provide fair treatment of radio stations and artists for the use of sound recordings, and for other purposes.
Title
American Music Fairness Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] |
Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 509. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-693. |
2022-12-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-12-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-11-16 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Nadler asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 4130, a bill originally introduced by Representative Deutch, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4932 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4972)