US HB4120 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grid Cybersecurity Research and Development Act This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to develop an initiative to mitigate the consequences on the electric grid from the results of cyberattacks by increasing cybersecurity capabilities of the electricity sector. Additionally, DOE must collaborate with other federal agencies, state agencies, and the private sector to develop guidance for research and demonstration activities to improve cybersecurity capabilities of the electricity sector. The National Institute of Standards and Technology must develop voluntary cybersecurity training standards that minimize duplication and maintain a public database of cybersecurity training programs. The Energy Sector Government Coordinating Council must develop a coordinated interagency strategic plan to advance cybersecurity capabilities in the electricity sector.
Title
Grid Cybersecurity Research and Development Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection. |
2017-10-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Industrial facilities
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Industrial facilities
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4120/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4120/BILLS-115hr4120ih.pdf |