US HB4092 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior, through the Coastal Program of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service, to work with willing partners and provide support to efforts to assess, protect, restore, and enhance important coastal areas that provide fish and wildlife habitat on which Federal trust species depend, and for other purposes.
Title
Coastal Habitat Conservation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2194 (Same As) 2022-06-15 - Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4092/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4092/BILLS-117hr4092ih.pdf |