US HB4091 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-23)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ARPA-E Reauthorization Act of 2019 This bill revises and reauthorizes through FY2024 the Advanced Research Projects Agency-Energy (ARPA-E) of the Department of Energy (DOE). The bill expands the goals of ARPA-E to include the development of energy technologies that (1) provide transformative solutions to improve the management, clean-up, and disposal of radioactive waste and spent nuclear fuel; and (2) improve the resilience, reliability, and security of infrastructure to produce, deliver, and store energy. ARPA-E must ensure that it does not provide grants for projects unless the prospective grantees demonstrate sufficient attempts to secure private financing or indicate that the projects are not independently commercially viable. The bill also authorizes DOE to enter into an agreement with the National Academy of Sciences to evaluate how well ARPA-E is achieving its goals and missions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ARPA-E Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]
Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 346.
2020-06-18HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-432.
2019-10-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-07-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-07-30HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1015-1016)
2019-07-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3915 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SB2714 (Related) 2020-01-07 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-195.
HB5685 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback